This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 07:45:56 (UTC).

BOOTH DEBORAH CHESLEY, CHESLEY JOSEPH FURBER Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2019 BOOTH DEBORAH CHESLEY, CHESLEY JOSEPH FURBER was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0423

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

CHESLEY JOSEPH FURBER

Applicant

BOOTH DEBORAH CHESLEY

Other

REGIONS BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

GREENSTEIN MALCOLM N.

 

Court Documents

PLD:PB CLAIM

07/05/2019 - PLD:PB CLAIM

PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

06/21/2019 - PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

05/07/2019 - PLD:PB AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

04/25/2019 - PLD:PB PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT

PLD:PB OATH

04/11/2019 - PLD:PB OATH

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

04/11/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

03/01/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

02/28/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

PLD:PB EFILED WILL

02/26/2019 - PLD:PB EFILED WILL

PLD:PB CLAIM

07/05/2019 - PLD:PB CLAIM

ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

07/05/2019 - ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

06/21/2019 - MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

PLD:PB CLAIM

05/02/2019 - PLD:PB CLAIM

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

04/11/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

04/11/2019 - PLD:PB FILE COPY OF LETTER

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

02/27/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/26/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

02/26/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB COPY FEE; Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB COPY FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $6.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB CERTIFICATION FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB UNALLOWED CLAIM; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB UNALLOWED CLAIM; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 9; Event Description: ISS:PB CLAIM LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 8; Event Description: PLD:PB CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:PB EFILED WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less