Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 05/27/2020 at 06:09:43 (UTC).

BLISS JENNIFER, KING JAMES Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/27/2019 BLISS JENNIFER, KING JAMES was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7082

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

KING JAMES

Applicant

BLISS JENNIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN

 

Court Documents

MSC:CV OTHER

09/20/2019 - MSC:CV OTHER

DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

09/20/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

09/17/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE OR UNSRVD

09/12/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE OR UNSRVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

09/12/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

09/10/2019 - RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

09/06/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

MSC:CV OTHER

09/06/2019 - MSC:CV OTHER

ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

09/06/2019 - ORD:CV EXTENSION OF TEXPO

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

09/06/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

09/04/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

08/27/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

08/27/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

08/27/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO SHERIFF; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:CV OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: VJ:CV VISITING JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV OTH OUTSIDE AGENCIES; Party Type: RS1; Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE OR UNSRVD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD NOT SERV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV TEMP EX PARTE ORD SERVD

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV EXT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CISNEROS LAUREN HARTMAN