Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/09/2020 at 02:41:36 (UTC).

BESA EDWARD, HART JUDITH Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2019 BESA EDWARD, HART JUDITH was filed as a Family - Harassment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6456

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Respondent

BESA EDWARD

Applicant

HART JUDITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

RILEY HILARY LYNN

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

10/10/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

08/16/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

08/16/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

08/08/2019 - RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

08/06/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

08/06/2019 - ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

08/05/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

08/05/2019 - OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO APD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV COPIES SENT TO DPS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV COP SENT TO APPLICANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: DM:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: CAL:PROT ORDER HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV PROTECTIVE ORD SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ORD:CV EX PARTE PROT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CIT PROTECT ORD & TRO; Party Type: RS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: OPN:CV APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORD; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MSF:CV PROTECTIVE ORDER; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RILEY HILARY LYNN