This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 04/07/2020 at 18:06:03 (UTC).

BERRIDGE MANUFACTURING COMPANY VS ATOMIC ROOFING AND SHEET METAL, LLC A/K/A ATOMIC SHEET METAL Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/21/2019 BERRIDGE MANUFACTURING COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ATOMIC ROOFING AND SHEET METAL, LLC A/K/A ATOMIC SHEET METAL. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2487

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERRIDGE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

Defendants

DIMENSIONAL ROOFING AND DIAGNOSTICS, L.L.C.

LAMZ MATTHEW

ATOMIC ROOFING AND SHEET METAL, LLC A/K/A ATOMIC SHEET METAL

WIELAND CLARENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOMRIG SEAN STEVEN VINCENT

 

Court Documents

PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

02/10/2020 - PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

ORD:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT PARTY

12/04/2019 - ORD:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT PARTY

MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

11/21/2019 - MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

PLD:CV ANSWER

07/03/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

06/05/2019 - PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

05/29/2019 - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PLD:CV CERT FROM SEC STATE

05/08/2019 - PLD:CV CERT FROM SEC STATE

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

05/08/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

05/08/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

05/08/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

05/08/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/25/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/25/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/25/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

03/25/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

03/21/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE JUDG RULE 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT PARTY; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:DEF JUDG ORD BY SUBMISSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER; Party Type: DF3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: PLD:CV CERT FROM SEC STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $16.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less