This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 03/20/2020 at 06:26:42 (UTC).

BAXLEY JOHN ARTHUR JR, MURPHEY THOMAS A Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 BAXLEY JOHN ARTHUR JR, MURPHEY THOMAS A was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0115

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Applicant

MURPHEY THOMAS A

Not Classified By Court

BAXLEY JOHN ARTHUR JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

WILLIAMS BENJAMIN KARL

 

Court Documents

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/17/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

PLD:PB PROOF OF HANDWRITING

02/11/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF OF HANDWRITING

PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

02/11/2019 - PLD:PB AMENDED APPLICATION

PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

02/05/2019 - PLD:PB DEATH CERTIFICATE

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

01/17/2019 - ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

01/17/2019 - MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/17/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

08/12/2019 - ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

07/31/2019 - PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB POSTED NOTICE RETURNED

PLD:PB WILL

01/18/2019 - PLD:PB WILL

MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

01/17/2019 - MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

01/17/2019 - OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

03/06/2019 - NTC:PB NOTICE TO CREDITORS

ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

02/12/2019 - ORD:PB WILL ADMITTED LTRS TEST

PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

02/12/2019 - PLD:PB PROOF DEATH OTHER FACTS

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ISS:PB LETTERS TESTAMENTARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB LETTERS REQUESTED; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:PB APPV INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB INVENTORY AFT 90TH DAY; Amount: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ORDER/JDGM; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB PROP ORD SENT TO CT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: PLD:PB INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ORDER/JDGM; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB INVENTORY AFT 90TH DAY; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:PB WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:PB PROBATE FILING; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 7; Event Description: ISS:PB FILE COPY OF ISSUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 6; Event Description: ISS:PB ABSTRACT FOR APPLICATIO; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:PB PSTD NOTICE LTRS TEST; Party Type: AA1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:PB CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:PB APPLICATION LETTERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:PB ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:PB PROBATE FILING; Party Type: AA1; Amount: $315.00

    Read MoreRead Less