This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 08:40:40 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 BANK OF AMERICA NA was filed as an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1445

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Defendant

SCULLY GABRIELLE

Garnishor

BANK OF AMERICA NA

Garnishee

WELLS FARGO BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Garnishor Attorneys

THOMAS TAYLOR

THOMAS TAYLOR RACHELLE

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

05/02/2019 - DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

04/26/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

04/26/2019 - NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

04/02/2019 - RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

ORD:CV WRIT

03/06/2019 - ORD:CV WRIT

MSC:CV GARNISHMENT NOTICE

02/19/2019 - MSC:CV GARNISHMENT NOTICE

MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

02/19/2019 - MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

02/19/2019 - OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:NOTICE OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:CV ORD OF DISMISSAL SGND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV WRIT RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV POSTJUDG GARNISHMENT; Party Type: GS1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ORD:CV WRIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: EMS:CV JUDGE'S ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: MSC:CV GARNISHMENT NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: MSC:CV CASE INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:CV APPLICATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV GARNISHMENT FILING FEE; Party Type: GR1; Amount: $247.00

    Read MoreRead Less