This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 05/07/2019 at 17:33:42 (UTC).

ASCR, INC. D/B/A STATEWIDE LIEN/TITLE SERVICE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 ASCR, INC D/B/A STATEWIDE LIEN/TITLE SERVICE was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0120

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Travis County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASCR, INC. D/B/A STATEWIDE LIEN/TITLE SERVICE

Defendant

TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF MOTOR VEHICLES

 

Court Documents

DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

01/29/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

01/22/2019 - PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

PLD:CV ANSWER

01/17/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/04/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • PMT:CV CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • PMT:CV COPY FEE CLERK MAKES; Amount: $28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • EMS:JUDGE'S ORD:UCDkt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • ISS:CV NOTICE JUDG RULE 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • ASM:CV COPY FEE CLERK MAKES; Amount: $28.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • ASM:CV CERTIFICATION FEE; Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • PLD:CV AMENDED PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PLD:CV ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less