This case was last updated from Texas Travis Court System on 03/20/2020 at 08:08:18 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Case Summary

On 01/11/2019 AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in Texas Travis Court System, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************0332

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Texas Travis Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

ALCALA LUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRONSKE THOMAS ERIK

Defendant Attorney

BELL KATHERYN COLE

 

Court Documents

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/25/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/11/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/11/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/11/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

05/02/2019 - DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

04/29/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

04/29/2019 - PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

04/10/2019 - PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

04/10/2019 - NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

02/27/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

MOT:CV SUMMARY JUDGMENT

02/27/2019 - MOT:CV SUMMARY JUDGMENT

PLD:CV ANSWER

02/07/2019 - PLD:CV ANSWER

RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

01/25/2019 - RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

01/11/2019 - ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION

PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

01/11/2019 - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

01/11/2019 - OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV NOTICE JUDG RULE 306

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: DSP:CV AGREED JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: TWONG:CV:AGREED JUDG SIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV RULE 11 AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV FILE COPY OF LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: NTC:CV FILING RECORDS & AFFID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: MOT:CV SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: PLD:CV ANSWER; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: RET:CV CITATION W/ AFFI SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ISS:CV CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: rcpt; Event Description: PMT:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 5; Event Description: ISS:CV FILE COPY OF CITATION; Party Type: DF1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 4; Event Description: PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 3; Event Description: OPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 2; Event Description: ASM:CV ISSUANCE FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvent Seq. No.: 1; Event Description: ASM:CV CIVIL FILING FEE; Party Type: PL1; Amount: $272.00

    Read MoreRead Less