This case was last updated from Travis County Courts on 10/31/2023 at 14:53:37 (UTC).

ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC., Plaintiff VS. CANYON ATLANTIC TEXAS, LLC, CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, LLC, Defendant

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC , Plaintiff filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CANYON ATLANTIC TEXAS, LLC, CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, LLC, Defendant. This case was filed in Travis County Courts, Heman Marion Sweatt Travis County Courthouse located in Travis, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is SHEPPERD, ERIC M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************3866

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Travis, Texas

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

SHEPPERD, ERIC M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADP TOTALSOURCE, INC.

Defendants

CANYON ATLANTIC TEXAS, LLC

CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Garcia, Matias Eduardo

 

Court Documents

PUBLIC - E-Filed Petition

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - Request

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV AMENDED ANSWER

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - NTC:CV OF NONSUIT

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ORD:CV PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CT2

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / NONSUIT

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / NONSUIT

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - ISS:CV NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / NONSUIT

CV County Clerk Public Documents

PUBLIC - PLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK

CV County Clerk Public Documents

 

Docket Entries

06/06/2023

DocketMSC:CV COPIES SENT; Comment: CLERK1@BARNETTGARCIA.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLD:CV LETTER TO CLERK; Comment: REQUEST FOR SIGN NS ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DispositionCase Non-Suited or Dismissed by Plaintiff

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketISS:CV NOTICE OF DISMISSAL / NONSUIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketDSP:CV ORDER OF NONSUIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketORD:CV PROPOSED ORDER/JUDGMENT CT2; Comment: Nonsuit Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNTC:CV OF NONSUIT; Comment: Notice of Nonsuit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/13/2023
View Court Documents

DocketPLD:CV AMENDED ANSWER; Comment: Defendant Canyon Plano's Original Answer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: ASSUREDCIVILPROCESSAGENCY@YAHOO.COM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMSC:CV REQUEST FOR CITATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPLD:CV AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Comment: Return of Service Plano

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketISS:CV CITATION; Comment: EFILETX@LAWGISTICPARTNERS.COM; Party: Defendant CANYON ATLANTIC TEXAS, LLC; Party: Defendant CANYON ATLANTIC-PLANO, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketE-Filed Petition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2022

DocketOPN:CV ORIGINAL PETITION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less