Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/18/2021 at 19:33:16 (UTC).

Yolanda Blaylock,TrueDFW02015-1 Homes LLC vs. Jasmine Nixon AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Yolanda Blaylock,TrueDFW02015-1 Homes LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Jasmine Nixon AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Charbonnet, Jason M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0709

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 6

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Charbonnet, Jason M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Blaylock, Yolanda

Dallas, TX 75230

TrueDFW02015-1 Homes LLC

11700 Preston Rd Suite 660, #518

Dallas, TX 75230

Defendant

Nixon, Jasmine

Fort Worth, TX 76123

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCharbonnet, Jason M) : 04/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketComments: LETTER WITH CORRECT DATE SENT TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: RESET NOTICE MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES. ORIGINALLY SET ON 4/23 AND WAS CONFLICT ON DOCKET. RESET TO 4/29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketZoom Hearing Scheduled: **STATUS HEARING** MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketOrder abating case entered per CDC Moratorium Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCDC Declaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-02156: TrueDFW02015-1 Homes LLC: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: Nixon, Jasmine: Returned Unserved 03/25/2021; Returned: 03/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCharbonnet, Jason M) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP6-2021-01469: TrueDFW02015-1 Homes LLC: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TrueDFW02015-1 Homes LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 276.00; Total Payments and Credits: 276.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketZoom Hearing Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCares Act Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Nixon, Jasmine: Served: 03/05/2021; Returned: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TrueDFW02015-1 Homes LLC is a litigant