Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 04/18/2021 at 13:38:58 (UTC).

YES HOMESALES LLC, DBA SLEEPY HOLLOW vs. TAMARA STONE AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 YES HOMESALES LLC, DBA SLEEPY HOLLOW filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TAMARA STONE AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0309

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YES HOMESALES LLC, DBA SLEEPY HOLLOW

1170 Sleepy Hollow Dr

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Defendants

STONE, TAMARA

Fort Worth, TX 76114

STOWE, TAMARA

Fort Worth, TX 76114

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Defendant; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment; Awarded To: TAMARA STOWE; Awarded Against: YES HOMESALES LLC, DBA SLEEPY HOLLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketHearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerGregory, Christopher)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCourt Notes: PLTF EMAILED LEASE AGREEMENT & 30 DAY VACATE NOTICE. ON HIS ORIGINAL EMAIL PLTF PUT THE WRONG CASE NUMBER. I CALLED & HE WILL RESUBMIT THE EMAIL WITH THE CORRECT CASE NUMBER & IT'S E00060309. CN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed: RYAN LOPEZ - AGENT COPY OF THE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCITATION: STONE, TAMARA: Served: 03/10/2021; Returned: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-1116: YES HOMESALES LLC, DBA SLEEPY HOLLOW: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff YES HOMESALES LLC, DBA SLEEPY HOLLOW; Total Financial Assessment: 121.00; Total Payments and Credits: 121.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less