Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 19:34:02 (UTC).

Yates Brothers Motor Company, Inc. vs Mikah T. Echols

Case Summary

On 12/08/2016 Yates Brothers Motor Company, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mikah T Echols. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********04-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yates Brothers Motor Company, Inc.

2101 Jacksboro Highway

Fort Worth, TX 76114

Defendant

Echols, Mikah T.

Desoto, TX 75115

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Shelby Sharpe

Defendant Attorney

Allen Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2017
  • Amended Notice to Take Deposition Doc ID# 11: OF MICAH T. ECHOLS AND SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Notice Doc ID# 10: Re: Intention to Take Oral Deposition of Mikah T. Echols and Subpoena Duces Tecum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Affidavit of Inability to Pay Doc ID# 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Counter/Cross Action Doc ID# 8: First Amended Answer and Counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • Notice of Appearance of Counsel Doc ID# 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Defendant's Pro Se Answer Copy Pltf Doc ID# 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • Paper Returned Doc ID# 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Citation by Certified Mail Doc ID# 4: 70112970000180799069

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • Citation: citn by certified mail 7011297000018079069; Echols, Mikah T.: Served: 12/14/2016; Returned: 12/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117183: Yates Brothers Motor Company, Inc.: (347.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Yates Brothers Motor Company, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 347.00; Total Payments and Credits: 347.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 347.00

    Read MoreRead Less