This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/15/2020 at 08:09:27 (UTC).

Xander Apartments vs Tatasheri Whitney and All Occupants

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Xander Apartments filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Tatasheri Whitney and All Occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********91-1

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Xander Apartments

5601 Bridge St Ste 504

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Defendants

& All Occupants

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Whitney, Tatasheri

Fort Worth, TX 76116

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Victor D. Huhem

Defendant Attorney

Amber Elliott Tilley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2020
  • FinancialInability to Pay Court Cost: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #12: electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement Index #11: for Final Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Agreement on record. Both parties and attys appeared. Legal Aid Stuart Campbell for Occupant. Sign paper Rule 11 Agreement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketOrder Setting Trial Index #10: eServed to both attys 12/16/19 ,...QC by BS, 12-17-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketLetter Requesting Setting for Trial Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Whitney, Tatasheri; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketLetter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Index #8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Pay Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Notice of Appeal Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Judgment Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Original Answer Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Request Source of Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Index #2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketOCA Appeal Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less