Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/03/2021 at 06:17:23 (UTC).

Woodmont Apartments, Ltd. dba Woodmont vs Darinda Buckingham, Beverly Walker And All Other Occupants

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Woodmont Apartments, Ltd dba Woodmont filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Darinda Buckingham, Beverly Walker And All Other Occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********12-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

dba Woodmont

6300 La Calma Dr Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Woodmont Apartments, Ltd.

6300 La Calma Dr Ste 150

Austin, TX 78752

Defendants

Buckingham, Darinda

Fort Worth, TX 76115

And All Other Occupants

Fort Worth, TX 76115

Walker, Beverly

Fort Worth, TX 76115

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott H Fournier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #12: Emailed and or mailed to all parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index #11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: sign paper order Nonsuit and distribute $$

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index #10: Prejudice and Motion for Funds in Registry to be Released to Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-159979: Woodmont Apartments, Ltd.: (10.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Woodmont Apartments, Ltd.; Total Financial Assessment: 10.00; Total Payments and Credits: 10.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #8: Re: Request for Copies of JP Evicition & Aff. of Inability to Pay...eServed to email in letter 3/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialInability to Pay Court Cost: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Buckingham, Darinda; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketLetter to Pauper Pro Bono Option Index #7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketLetter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Pay Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJP Judgment Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJP Request Source of Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketJP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Index #2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOCA Appeal Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WOODMONT COMPANIES is a litigant

Latest cases where WOODMONT APARTMENTS, LTD. dba WOODMONT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott H Fournier