This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/19/2017 at 21:40:12 (UTC).

WILSHIRE vs. TOBY BLANKS AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/04/2014 WILSHIRE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TOBY BLANKS AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Curnutt, Mary Tom. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3881

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Curnutt, Mary Tom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE

1736 Randol Mill Rd

Arlington, TX 76012

Defendant

BLANKS, TOBY

Arlington, TX 76012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2014
  • Dispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution; (Judicial Officer: Curnutt, Mary Tom)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Non-Jury Trial: (9:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerCurnutt, Mary Tom) : Result: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • Motion for Alternate Service Filed and Approved: REISSUED CITN TO CONST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • EVICTION: BLANKS, TOBY: Served: 04/08/2014; Returned: 04/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • Generate Label

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP2-2014-01309: WILSHIRE: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff WILSHIRE; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE LAW OFFICE is a litigant