This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 05/10/2022 at 04:36:48 (UTC).

Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Cvi Amr Investment Trust vs. Anne Walters

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Cvi Amr Investment Trust filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Anne Walters. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************0713

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Cvi Amr Investment Trust

P.O. Box 115220

Carrollton, TX 75011

Defendant

Walters, Anne

North Richland Hills, TX 76180

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Cooper

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPre-Trial Mediation: (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Pre-Trial Mediation Hearing: SET FOR 06/08/2022 @ 1PM EMAILED VIA OUTLOOK INVITATION TO ALL PARTIES//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketUnrelated Case Party Contacted Court: DEFN'S SON WANTED TO CHECK ON CASE STATUS//MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketCourt Notes: NO ACTION TAKEN//CASE WILL PROCEED TO PTM//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Filed: Motion for Default Judgment/EFILED/ NO ACTION TAKEN/ ANSWER FILED 2.3.22/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketUnrelated Case Party Contacted Court: DEFN'S SON CHECKED ON THE CASE STATUS//MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketUpdated Party Information: DEFN'S EMAIL / PHONE #// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: VIA EMAIL// BY DEFN PRO SE// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketUnrelated Case Party Contacted Court: DEFN'S SON HELPED HIS MOTHER/INFORMED CT HE HAS POWER OF ATTY/CLERK ASSISTED DEFN'S SON TO JP1 WEBSITE TO FORMS PAGE//MLN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com//CA; Walters, Anne: Served: 01/22/2022; Returned: 01/24/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEmailed: COPY OF CITN AND PETN TO PPS//CA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-00200: Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Cvi Amr Investment Trust: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Trustee Of Cvi Amr Investment Trust; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/EMAIL TO: mjscourts@abclegal.com/HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilmington Savings Fund Society FSB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew W Cooper