This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 01/27/2023 at 16:38:46 (UTC).

Westlake Gardens vs. Stacy Butler AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 11/29/2022 Westlake Gardens filed an Other lawsuit against Stacy Butler AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4086

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westlake Gardens

1823 S. Las Vegas Trail

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Defendant

Butler , Stacy

Fort Worth, TX 76108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment of $1,966.15; Awarded To: Westlake Gardens ; Awarded Against: Stacy Butler

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketMailed: TO ALL PARTIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketEviction Hearing: (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : Result: Judgment:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: EXC ALT SERV 12/1/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-6008: Westlake Gardens: (108.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Westlake Gardens; Total Financial Assessment: 129.00; Total Payments and Credits: 129.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 129.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCITATION: Butler , Stacy: Served: 12/01/2022; Returned: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Vacate Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Status Proof Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMilitary Affidavit Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Guide and File - Petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: CO6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTLAKE GARDENS is a litigant