This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/15/2017 at 06:21:13 (UTC).

WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICE DBA VILLAS BY THE LAKES vs. ARLENE SCOTT AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 12/09/2015 WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICE DBA VILLAS BY THE LAKES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARLENE SCOTT AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4240

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICE DBA VILLAS BY THE LAKES

Defendant

SCOTT, ARLENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $1,855.22; Awarded To: WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICE DBA VILLAS BY THE LAKES; Awarded Against: ARLENE SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned - Cancelled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: SCOTT, ARLENE: Returned Unserved 02/19/2016; Returned: 02/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketEvict - Default Judgment for Poss, & Past Due Rent: OF $1855.22 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketDefault Notice Mailed: BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Woodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXECUTED TO ARLENE SCOTT;COURT DATE 12/21/15 AT 8:30AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: SCOTT, ARLENE: Served: 12/14/2015; Returned: 12/14/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): CITATION PRINTED AND ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2016-00420: WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICE DBA VILLAS BY THE LAKES: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-04358: WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICE DBA VILLAS BY THE LAKES: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICE DBA VILLAS BY THE LAKES; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due as of 02/15/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN RIM PROPERTY SERVICES, INC. D/B/A ORION FRISCO F/K/A THE ESTATES OF LITTLE ELM is a litigant