This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 07/04/2022 at 10:32:20 (UTC).

WALTER FOSTER vs. CAPITAL ONE BANK

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 WALTER FOSTER filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE BANK. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************5934

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Foster, Walter

Euless, TX 76040

Garnishee

Capital One Bank

2219 N Collins St

Arlington, TX 76001

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L Marc-Charles Girling

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (8:15 AM) () : SET FOR DWOP IF NO ACTIVITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketEmailed: WOG W/INTEREST CALCULATION FOR SERVICE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT: CAPITAL ONE BANK: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketWrit Issued: APPROVED & SIGNED BY JUDGE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketRequest for Service: REQ FOR WOG TO BE SENT TO ATTY GIRLING AT DALLASPARALEGAL.GIRLING@GMAIL.COM. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: AFF FOR WOG AFTER JGMT. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP3-2022-01939: Foster, Walter: (38.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff FOSTER, WALTER; Total Financial Assessment: 59.00; Total Payments and Credits: 59.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 59.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Garnishment Filed: VIA EFILE. FOR ORIG CASE E48852. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer L Marc-Charles Girling