Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/26/2018 at 08:03:33 (UTC).

VERONYCA WILLIAMS vs HUMBERTO HUERTA-ALANIS and NORMA SANTILLON-SANDOVAL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 VERONYCA WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HUMBERTO HUERTA-ALANIS and NORMA SANTILLON-SANDOVAL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********74-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, VERONYCA

Defendants

HUERTA-ALANIS, HUMBERTO

Fort Worth, TX 76134-5560

SANTILLON-SANDOVAL, NORMA

Fort Worth, TX 76134-5560

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jane DeLeeuw

Defendant Attorney

J MATTHEW CROSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • Dispositions: Order of Dismissal With Prejudice; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Order of Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID#15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Letter Doc ID#14: Re: Motion To Dismiss and Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Motion to Dismiss Doc ID#13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Letter Doc ID#12: RE:Rule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Rule 11 Agreement Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Letter Doc ID#10: Re: Certificate of Written Discovery

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • Certificate of Written Discovery Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Letter Doc ID#8: Cover Letter Re: Rule 11 Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Rule 11 Agreement Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Letter Doc ID#6: Re: Defendants' Original Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Defendant's Original Answer Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; HUERTA-ALANIS, HUMBERTO: Served: 02/08/2018; Returned: 02/08/2018; SANTILLON-SANDOVAL, NORMA: Served: 02/08/2018; Returned: 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: and Request For Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-128754: WILLIAMS, VERONYCA: (268.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff WILLIAMS, VERONYCA; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 268.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Deleeuw, Jane