This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/18/2017 at 14:59:18 (UTC).

VERAISON VILLAGE APARTMENTS vs. EUGENE WRIGHT AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 08/17/2015 VERAISON VILLAGE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EUGENE WRIGHT AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 8 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Woodard, Lisa R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2955

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Woodard, Lisa R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VERAISON VILLAGE APARTMENTS

Defendant

WRIGHT, EUGENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Judgment for Plaintiff; (Judicial Officer: Woodard, Lisa R) ; Judgment of $880.00; Awarded To: VERAISON VILLAGE APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: EUGENE WRIGHT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned: WRIT EXECUTED IN LAWFUL MANNER - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: WRIGHT, EUGENE: Served: 09/14/2015; Returned: 09/15/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested: BY PLTF * KEJ

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketEvict -Judgment / Pltf / Poss/ Past Due Rent / CC: OF $880.00 + CC - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketCANCELED: Hearing; (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) ; Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketHearing: (8:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerWoodard, Lisa R) : Result: Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • DocketComments: RET EXECUTED VIA RULE 510.4C;COURT DATE 09/02/15 @8:30AM - BTW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: WRIGHT, EUGENE: Served: 08/24/2015; Returned: 08/27/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2015
  • DocketRequest For Alternate Service Filed and Approved: ..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2015
  • DocketEVICTION: WRIGHT, EUGENE: Returned Unserved 08/21/2015; Returned: 08/21/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening): PRINTED AND ISSUED TO C08..RDK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-03204: HUHEM LAW FIRM: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2015
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP8-2015-02862: HUHEM LAW FIRM: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff VERAISON VILLAGE APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 271.00; Total Payments and Credits: 271.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERAISON VILLAGE APARTMENTS is a litigant