Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/31/2021 at 04:30:28 (UTC).

Velocity Investments, LLC Assignee Of Onemain Financial 2016-2 vs. Abraham Frichithavong

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Velocity Investments, LLC Assignee Of Onemain Financial 2016-2 filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Abraham Frichithavong. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7560

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments, LLC Assignee Of Onemain Financial 2016-2

Po Box 788

Wall, NJ 07719

Defendant

Frichithavong, Abraham

Haltom City, TX 76137

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE COLBY SCHERER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketClerk Follow up/ Answer Due: (8:00 AM) (Judicial OfficerSwearingin, Ralph, JR) : 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketAnswer Due On: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service//EFILED//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Frichithavong, Abraham: Served: 03/09/2021; Returned: 03/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01153: Velocity Investments, LLC Assignee Of Onemain Financial 2016-2: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Velocity Investments, LLC Assignee Of Onemain Financial 2016-2; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George C. Scherer