Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/31/2021 at 04:30:41 (UTC).

Velocity Investments LLC Assignee Of Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc vs. Britany Banks

Case Summary

On 03/03/2021 Velocity Investments LLC Assignee Of Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Britany Banks. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************7567

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Velocity Investments LLC Assignee Of Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc

Po Box 788

Wall, NJ 07719

Defendant

Banks, Britany

Fort Worth, TX 76112

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brandi Marie Addison

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEmailed: SIGNED ORDER TO PLTF ATTY//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketOrder of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: EMAIL TO PLTF ATTY//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMotion for Non-Suit Filed: EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCover Letter Filed: EFILED//JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketEmailed: TO PLTF ATTY//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketOption Letter Mailed: MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Filed: Non-Service Return// EFILED// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCITATION: EMAIL ABC LEGAL//MB; Banks, Britany: Returned Unserved 03/17/2021; Returned: 03/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1TF-2021-01169: Velocity Investments LLC Assignee Of Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc: (46.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Velocity Investments LLC Assignee Of Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc; Total Financial Assessment: 46.00; Total Payments and Credits: 46.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 46.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED//EMAIL TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//MB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Velocity Investments, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandi Marie Addison