This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/03/2022 at 10:47:34 (UTC).

Tyler Granger vs Marissa Benson

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 Tyler Granger filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Marissa Benson. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********47-3

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Granger, Tyler

Defendant

Benson, Marissa

Fort Worth, TX 76133

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James R. Baudhuin

Defendant Attorneys

Janet K. Colaneri

Paige Anders Lewiecki

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice to Take Deposition Index # 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 11: RE: Defendant's Notice to Take Deposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDefendant's First Amended Original Answer Index # 10: Defendant's First Amended Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketLetter Re: Objection & Response to Discovery Index # 9: Letter Serving Def's Objs & Resp to INT & RFP and 1st Supp Resp to Initial Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketLetter Re: Interrogatories to Plaintiff Index # 8: Letter Serving Discovery on Plaintiffs (INT & RFP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketLetter Re: Interrogatories to Plaintiff Index # 7: Letter Serving Def's Resp to Initial Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177968: Benson, Marissa: (40.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Benson, Marissa; Total Financial Assessment: 40.00; Total Payments and Credits: 40.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketJury Fee Payment Index # 6: Letter RE: Payment of Jury Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Marissa Benson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-177136: Granger, Tyler: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Granger, Tyler; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for Attorney; Benson, Marissa: Served: 11/03/2021; Returned: 11/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R. Baudhuin