This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/25/2022 at 08:04:50 (UTC).

Truist, formerly known as Branch Banking & Trust Company vs Raquel Borrego

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Truist, formerly known as Branch Banking Trust Company filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Raquel Borrego. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********68-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Truist

4251 Fayetteville Road

Lumberton, NC 28358

fka Branch Banking & Trust Company

Defendant

Borrego, Raquel

Fort Worth, TX 76164-9146

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jody D. Jenkins

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Raquel Borrego

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-179080: Truist: (221.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Truist; Total Financial Assessment: 358.00; Total Payments and Credits: 358.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 358.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCitation: eserved to Attorney; Borrego, Raquel: Served: 02/07/2022; Returned: 03/31/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where fka Branch Banking & Trust Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Truist Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jody D. Jenkins