This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/26/2023 at 10:07:06 (UTC).

Troy Capital, LLC vs PNC Bank

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 Troy Capital, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against PNC Bank. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********30-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Troy Capital, LLC

Defendants

PNC Bank

C/O Corporation Service Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 8: (Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketDispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketOrder for Non-Suit Index # 7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Non-Suit Index # 6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketLetter Index # 5: RE: Filing Notice and Proposed Order for Non-Suit

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (PNC Bank)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-189794: Troy Capital, LLC: (236.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Troy Capital, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 373.00; Total Payments and Credits: 373.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 373.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketWrit of Garnishment: Mailed to Attorney 2/7/23; PNC Bank: Served: 03/02/2023; Returned: 03/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Issuance of Writ of Garnishment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 2: Application for Writ of Garnishment after Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Post Garnishment Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less