Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/02/2017 at 12:24:21 (UTC).

TROY CAPITAL, LLC vs CHRISTOPHER RIOJAS, and ROSALINDA RIOJAS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 TROY CAPITAL, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER RIOJAS, and ROSALINDA RIOJAS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********54-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TROY CAPITAL, LLC

Defendants

RIOJAS, CHRISTOPHER

Fort Worth, TX 76115-2229

RIOJAS, ROSALINDA

Fort Worth, TX 76115-2229

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J Adams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • Dispositions: Order of Non Suit; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Order for Non-Suit Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#7: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#6: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Letter Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID#4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • Citation: EZ Messenger; RIOJAS, CHRISTOPHER: Returned Unserved 05/11/2017; Returned: 05/11/2017; RIOJAS, ROSALINDA: Returned Unserved 05/11/2017; Returned: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118812: TROY CAPITAL, LLC: (257.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TROY CAPITAL, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 257.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Troy Capital LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J. Adams