Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 05/04/2021 at 08:00:57 (UTC).

Travis Trojan, and Cammy Null vs Mid-America Apartments, LP d/b/a Colonial Village At Willow Creek Apartments

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 Travis Trojan, and Cammy Null filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Mid-America Apartments, LP d/b/a Colonial Village At Willow Creek Apartments. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********43-1

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trojan, Travis

Null, Cammy

Defendants

d/b/a Colonial Village At Willow Creek Apartments

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Mid-America Apartments, LP

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

B/S CT Corporation System, Registered Agent

1999 Bryan Street, Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201-3136

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen C. Maxwell

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: (Mid-America Apartments LP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171296: Mid-America Apartments, LP: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Mid-America Apartments, LP; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCitation: eserved to attorney; Mid-America Apartments, LP: Served: 04/09/2021; Returned: 04/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: Request for citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Plaintiffs' Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mid-America Apartments L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen C. Maxwell