Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 20:43:01 (UTC).

Travelers Indemnity Company of America and The Charter Oaks Insurance Group vs DFW Labor, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/19/2016 Travelers Indemnity Company of America and The Charter Oaks Insurance Group filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DFW Labor, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********86-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travelers Indemnity Company of America

Defendants

b/s Shea Somodevilla

Grapevine, TX 76051

DFW Labor, LLC

2200 Chatam Hill

Grapevine, TX 76051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kimberly A. Guest

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2017
  • Citation: mailed to atty; DFW Labor, LLC: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Letter Doc ID# 6: RE: First Amended Petition - Issue Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Doc ID# 5: with Requests for Disclosures and Requests for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Citation: Mail to Attorney; DFW Labor, LLC: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Letter Doc ID# 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2: with Requests for Disclosure and Requests for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117735: Travelers Indemnity Company of America: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117547: Travelers Indemnity Company of America: (253.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Travelers Indemnity Company of America; Total Financial Assessment: 257.00; Total Payments and Credits: 257.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 253.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kimberly A. Guest