This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/21/2022 at 21:12:26 (UTC).

Transport Funding, LLC vs Banetcom LLC, and Roland Balossa

Case Summary

On 07/18/2022 Transport Funding, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Banetcom LLC, and Roland Balossa. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********98-1

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Transport Funding, LLC

Defendants

Balossa, Roland

Arlington, TX 76002

or any other place where he may be found

Banetcom LLC

928 La Sierra Drive

Crowley, TX 76036

a limited liability company

or any other place where she may be found

b/s Registered Agent, Tondonne Balossa

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James W. King

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 12: Citation Return Unserved on BanetCom LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 11: Writ of Sequestration Return Unserved on BanetCom LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketWrit of Sequestration: PCT 6 and PCT 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketCitation: PCT 6 and PCT 7; Banetcom LLC: Returned Unserved 09/16/2022; Returned: 09/16/2022; Balossa, Roland: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 10: RE: Filing the Bond of Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketBond for Sequestration Index # 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-185208: Transport Funding, LLC: (553.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 553.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 8: RE: Request for Copies/Citations/Writs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 7: /Copy of Bond for Sequestration (Waiting on Original Bond)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 6: (Electronically Served to all Attorney's and/or Mailed to All Parties)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2022
  • DocketOrder for Sequestration Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184128: Transport Funding, LLC: (213.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Transport Funding, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 903.00; Total Payments and Credits: 903.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Status Index # 3: Affidavit of Non Military Status

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2: Original Petition for Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where or any other place where she may be found is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant

Latest cases where TRANSPORT FUNDING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ASSIGNEE OF TF LEASING CO. A DELAWARE BUSINESS TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer King, James W