Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/09/2017 at 20:05:32 (UTC).

Transport Funding, LLC, Assignee of Arrow Truck Sales, Inc. vs Mark Al Taher f/k/a Mohammed Hani Hamzah, Uruk Transportation, Inc., and Kimetra Givens a/k/a Kemetra Givens a/k/a Kemetra Givens-Hill

Case Summary

On 12/13/2016 Transport Funding, LLC, Assignee of Arrow Truck Sales, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Mark Al Taher f/k/a Mohammed Hani Hamzah, Uruk Transportation, Inc , and Kimetra Givens a/k/a Kemetra Givens a/k/a Kemetra Givens-Hill. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********37-2

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Transport Funding, LLC

Assignee of Arrow Truck Sales, Inc.

Defendants

f/k/a Mohammed Hani Hamzah

Dallas, TX 75248

a/k/a Kemetra Givens a/k/a Kemetra Givens-Hill

Dallas, TX 75243

Givens, Kimetra

Dallas, TX 75243

Taher, Mark Al

Dallas, TX 75248

n/k/a Mark Al Taher

Dallas, TX 75248

b/s its Registered Agent, Mohammad Hani Hamzah

15905 Bent Tree Forest Cir., Apartment 1031

Dallas, TX 75248

Uruk Transportation, Inc.

15905 Bent Tree Forest Cir., Apartment 1031

Dallas, TX 75248

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James W. King

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2017
  • Writ of Sequestration: Mailed to Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Citation: Mailed to Attorney; Taher, Mark Al: Unserved ; Uruk Transportation, Inc.: Unserved ; Givens, Kimetra: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Bond for Sequestration Doc ID# 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Bond Doc ID# 6: for Sequestration Copy to Submit Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Letter Doc ID# 8: Submitting Bonds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Order for Sequestration Doc ID# 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Letter Doc ID# 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Civil Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 2: for Sequestration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2016
  • Original Petition Doc ID# 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-118681: Transport Funding, LLC: (27.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Transaction Assessment: 27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-117364: Transport Funding, LLC: (249.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Transport Funding, LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 276.00; Total Payments and Credits: 276.00; Balance Due as of 02/09/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 249.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSPORT FUNDING LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ASSIGNEE OF TF LEASING CO. A DELAWARE BUSINESS TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer King, James W