Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/17/2021 at 08:10:00 (UTC).

Traffix Devices, Inc. vs WB Supply LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Traffix Devices, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WB Supply LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********81-2

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

dba TrafFix Devices

Traffix Devices, Inc.

Defendants

WB Supply LLC

211 E. 7Th Street, Ste. 620

Austin, TX 78701

, a Delaware Limited Liability Company, dba WB Supply, LLC an affiliate of Basin Supply LP, WB Supply, LLC, WBS Supply LLC, WB Oilfield Supplies, WB Supply Company, WB Supply, and WB

B/S Its Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company

Dba, CSC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Roth

Defendant Attorney

Julie L. Griffis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4: return of service, with attachment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170075: Traffix Devices, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Traffix Devices, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCitation: Hold for attorney Roth p/u - picked up 03/11; WB Supply LLC: Served: 03/18/2021; Returned: 03/31/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Traffix Devices, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where WB Supply LLC is a litigant