Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 08/05/2021 at 08:37:36 (UTC).

Tracey Tuel vs Ex Parte

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Tracey Tuel filed an Other lawsuit against Ex Parte. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Rymell, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********80-2

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #2 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Rymell, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tuel, Tracey

Arlington, TX 76017

Defendant

Ex Parte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hani Francis Kobty

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketAA Attendance Report Index # 8: Good Cause Stamp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAA Attendance Report Index # 7: Ltr to Court providing Proof of Attendance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAA Attendance Report Index # 6: Good Cause Stamp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • FinancialCounter: Receipt # CCL-0375648: Hani Kobty: (14.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Rymell, Jennifer)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketFinal Judgment Index # 4: Occupational Driver's License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Ol granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-171045: Tuel, Tracy: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Tuel, Tracey; Total Financial Assessment: 268.00; Total Payments and Credits: 268.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketAffidavit Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Occupational Drivers License Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketPetition - Occupational Drivers License Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hani Francis Kobty