Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/18/2019 at 08:09:51 (UTC).

Toni Watkins as Independent Administrator of the Estates of Dewey Struck and Zoetta Struck, Deceased vs Tarrant County Hospital District d/b/a JPS Health Network a/k/a John Peter Smith Hospital

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Toni Watkins as Independent Administrator of the Estates of Dewey Struck and Zoetta Struck, Deceased filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tarrant County Hospital District d/b/a JPS Health Network a/k/a John Peter Smith Hospital. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********97-1

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

as Independent Administrator of the Estates of Dewey Struck

Watkins, Toni

Struck, Zoetta

Defendants

Tarrant County Hospital District Also Known As John Peter Smith Hospital Doing Business As JPS Health Network

Fort Worth, TX 76104

b/s registered agent, Sharon R. Clark

Fort Worth, TX 76104-4917

b/s registered agent, Robert Early

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen C. Maxwell

Defendant Attorney

Roel J Fabela

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • Judge Docket Entry: sonsuited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Defendant's Original Answer W/Req Disclosure Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Paper Returned Doc ID#5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Citation: atty basket 3-27-19; Tarrant County Hospital District: Served: 04/03/2019; Returned: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Letter Requesting Alias Citation Doc ID#4: hold

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Citation: 1/25/2019 Mailed to Atty; Tarrant County Hospital District: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Plaintiff's First Amended Petition Doc ID#3: and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Citation: mailed to Attorney; Tarrant County Hospital District: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Original Petition Doc ID#2: and Request for Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Original Petition Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-145228: Watkins, Toni: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-142831: Watkins, Toni: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Transaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • eFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-142335: Watkins, Toni: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff Watkins, Toni; Total Financial Assessment: 266.00; Total Payments and Credits: 266.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roel J Fabela