Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 17:51:06 (UTC).

Timothy S. Steffenhagen and Mary B. Steffenhagen vs John David Bailey

Case Summary

On 11/09/2020 Timothy S Steffenhagen and Mary B Steffenhagen filed an Other lawsuit against John David Bailey. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********26-1

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steffenhagen, Timothy S

Steffenhagen, Mary B

Defendant

Bailey, John David

Richland Hills, TX 76118

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce L. Mansfield

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL T MABERY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index #8: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOrder Index #7: on Summary Motion to Remove Invalid Mechanic's Lien

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: Zoom hearing re lien removal. Defendant not appear. court will sign order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment: (10:15 AM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index #6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index #5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCitation: mailed to atty; Bailey, John David: Served: 11/30/2020; Returned: 12/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-166965: Steffenhagen, Timothy S: (4.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketLetter Index #3: Letter to Court Requesting Issue of Citation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-166654: Steffenhagen, Timothy S: (254.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Steffenhagen, Timothy S; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 254.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2: and Summary Motion to Remove Invalid Mechanic's and Materialmen's Lien and Request for Disclosures

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce L. Mansfield