This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 07/19/2022 at 09:01:24 (UTC).

Tiffany Potts vs Palo Alto Equity Enterprises, LLC and Palo Alton Apartments

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 Tiffany Potts filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Palo Alto Equity Enterprises, LLC and Palo Alton Apartments. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********10-3

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Potts, Tiffany

Bedford, TX 76021

Defendants

Palo Alto Equity Enterprises, LLC

8144 Walnut Hill Lane Suite 1080

Dallas, TX 75231

a limited liability company

b/s registered agent, Griffin Harris PLLC

Palo Alton Apartments

8144 Walnut Hill Lane Suite 1080

Dallas, TX 75231

b/s registered agent, Griffin Harris PLLC,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brooks P. Lynn

Defendant Attorney

Victor D. Huhem

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDefendant's Original Answer Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 4: Palo Alto Apartments

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 3: Palo Alto Equity Enterprises, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181310: Potts, Tiffany: (229.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff Potts, Tiffany; Total Financial Assessment: 366.00; Total Payments and Credits: 366.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 366.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketCitation: Mailed to Attorney 4/14/22; Palo Alto Equity Enterprises, LLC: Served: 05/05/2022; Returned: 05/06/2022; Palo Alton Apartments: Served: 05/05/2022; Returned: 05/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PALO ALTO APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brooks P. Lynn