Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/30/2017 at 05:01:24 (UTC).

Thu Jamie Nguyen vs Cornelius Cooper and all occupants

Case Summary

On 02/13/2017 Thu Jamie Nguyen filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Cornelius Cooper and all occupants. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********01-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nguyen, Thu Jamie

Arlington, TX 76006

Defendants

Cooper, Cornelius

Fort Worth, TX 76104

and all occupants

Fort Worth, TX 76104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • Dispositions: Order of Non Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Order for Non-Suit Doc ID#11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Civil Docket Doc ID#10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) (Judicial OfficerPierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Order Setting Trial Doc ID#9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Letter Requesting Setting for Trial Doc ID#3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Letter to Pauper Pro Bono Option Doc ID#8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Letter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Doc ID#7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • JP Transcript of Judgment Doc ID#6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Affidavit of Inability to Pay Doc ID#5: approved February 8, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • JP Judgment Doc ID#4: signed January 23, 2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • JP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Doc ID#2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • OCA Appeal Doc ID#1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • Inability to Pay Court Cost: 249.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Financial Information: Defendant Cooper, Cornelius; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 249.00

    Read MoreRead Less