This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/17/2022 at 17:10:57 (UTC).

THOMAS MUCHA vs. BEAR CREEK LL, LLC c/o INVESTCORP,BEAR CREEK NORSTAR USA, LLC,CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY D/B/A CSC-LAWYERS INC,(NORSTAR) ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

Case Summary

On 06/09/2022 THOMAS MUCHA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEAR CREEK LL, LLC c/o INVESTCORP,BEAR CREEK NORSTAR USA, LLC,CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY D/B/A CSC-LAWYERS INC, NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1198

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUCHA, THOMAS

Fort Worth, TX 76131

Defendants

(NORSTAR) ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT

211 E. 7Th Street, Suite #620

Austin, TX 78701

BEAR CREEK LL, LLC c/o INVESTCORP

251 Little Falls Drive

Wilmington, DE 19808

BEAR CREEK NORSTAR USA, LLC

5400 Renaissance Tower 1201 Elm St

Dallas, TX 75270

CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY D/B/A CSC-LAWYERS INC

211 E 7Th Street, Suite 620

Austin, TX 78701

ATTN: CORP. SERVICE COMPANY d/b/a CSC LAWYERS INC.

ATTN: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

ATTN: MICHAEL F ALESSIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

GLYNIS ZAVARELLI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketClerk Follow Up: (5:05 PM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : WAITING ON 2 OTHER DEFN'S TO BE SRV'D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCitation Returned: SERVED ON 7/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketAnswer Filed: Defendants' Bear Creek Norstar USA, LLC and Norstar Accolade Property Management's Original Answer and Jury Demand

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketProcess Service Fee Charge (Indirect Fee Added): OUT OF CO. TRAVIS CO FEE $80.00 ($80.00 for SC-11198)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketSMALL CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCitation Issued: mailed to Travis Co Pct 3 with m/o #22-00029480 (w/citn on SC-11197)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketComments: Out of Co info on (Norstar) Accolade Property

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketComments: Out of Co. info on Bear Creek Norstar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketPlaintiff Filed: via email instructions on out of county & out of state info also an email agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketSent to Judge For Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • FinancialMail Payment: Receipt # JP4-2022-2671: MUCHA, THOMAS: (54.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketEmailed: receipt to pltf on case #SC-11198

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComments: Pltf paid filing fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff MUCHA, THOMAS; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketCourt Notes: Case was rej'd before an email from the pltf was read - pltf is to pay $54.00 by 6/17/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORSTAR ACCOLADE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases where SERVICE is a litigant