Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/04/2021 at 23:12:36 (UTC).

THOMAS F DUNN vs. MICHAEL D HAMBLEN,DAVID G HAMBLEN

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 THOMAS F DUNN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL D HAMBLEN,DAVID G HAMBLEN. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1767

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 2

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNN, THOMAS F

Defendants

HAMBLEN, MICHAEL D

Cedar Hill, TX 76104

HAMBLEN, DAVID G

Cedar Hill, TX 75104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas F. Dunn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDispositions: Dismissed for Want of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal/Want of Prosecution W/O Prejudice Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up; (8:00 AM) () ; Non-Suit/Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketLetter Mailed for Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution: CITATIONS ISSUED OVER 90 DAYS - NO PROOF OF SERVICE FOR DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCANCELED: Clerk Follow Up/3 Months; (8:00 AM) () ; Other

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCitation Issued: RCVD BY INPUT CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketCITATION: PPS-PLAINTIFF; HAMBLEN, MICHAEL D: Unserved ; HAMBLEN, DAVID G: Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff Contacted Court: ? STATUS OF SERVICE, ADV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP2-2020-03057: DUNN, THOMAS F: (53.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff DUNN, THOMAS F; Total Financial Assessment: 53.00; Total Payments and Credits: 53.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 53.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: civil case information sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiff's Original Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas F. Dunn