This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 09/18/2022 at 19:28:54 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs Hestia Properties, LLC, a Texas Limited Liability Company, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 The State of Texas filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Hestia Properties, LLC, a Texas Limited Liability Company. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #3 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Hrabal, Mike. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********64-3

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Hrabal, Mike

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The State of Texas

Austin, TX 78711

Defendants

City of Fort Worth, Texas

Fort Worth, TX 76102

b/s City Secretary, Mary J. Kayser

City Hall

Hestia Properties, LLC

4113 German Pointer Way

Fort Worth, TX 76163

b/s registered agent, Ronald W. Day

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE LYNN LEVY

Defendant Attorney

Barbara M Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 22: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds Index # 21: Agreed Order Disbursinsg Funds

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-184931: The State of Texas: (8.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 8.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 20: RE: Request for Copies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 19: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Final Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Hrabal, Mike)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment Index # 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 17: Letter re: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice Index # 16: of Lien and Claim for Payment

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing by Special Commissioners Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioners Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Index # 4: for Taxing Entities

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners Index # 5: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-181157: The State of Texas: (213.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff The State of Texas; Total Financial Assessment: 376.00; Total Payments and Credits: 376.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: Cover Letter for Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Condemnation Index # 2: Petition for Condemnation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Condemnation Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY HALL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY, KATHERINE LYNN