This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 03/11/2017 at 02:43:40 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs Chesapeake Land Development Co., LLC.

Case Summary

On 06/19/2014 The State of Texas filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Chesapeake Land Development Co , LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********88-1

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The State of Texas

Defendants

Chesapeake Land Development Company, LLC.

Chesapeake Operating, Inc.

Lamar Advantage Outdoor Company, L.P.

An Oklahoma Corporation

A Delaware Limited Partnership

An Oklahoma Limited Liability Company f/k/a Chesapeake Land Company, L.L.C., An Oklahoma Limited Liability Company

b/s its registered agent, CT Corporation System

b/s its registered agent, Capitol Corporate Services, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sarah Jane Munson

Defendant Attorneys

Clark H Rucker

J ALLEN SMITH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • DocketBill of Cost Doc ID#32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketCivil Docket Doc ID#31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • DocketJudgment - Agreed Doc ID#30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketVacation Letter Doc ID#29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2015
  • DocketRule 11 Agreement Doc ID#28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • DocketVacation Letter Doc ID#27: Vacation Letter for Clark Rucker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • DocketPaper Returned Doc ID#26: Chesapeake Operating Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2014
  • DocketPaper Returned Doc ID#25: Chesapeake Land Development Company LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds Doc ID#24: Mailed copy to all parties & sent to Accounting 10/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-30295: Chesapeake Land Development Company, LLC.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-29653: Chesapeake Land Development Company, LLC.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-28326: Chesapeake Land Development Company, LLC.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-28078: Chesapeake Land Development Company, LLC.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-20009: Chesapeake Land Development Company, LLC.: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Defendant Chesapeake Land Development Company, LLC.; Total Financial Assessment: 14.00; Total Payments and Credits: 14.00; Balance Due as of 03/10/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less