This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 12/04/2022 at 07:16:37 (UTC).

The State of Texas vs Alps Realty of Texas, Inc., a Texas Corporation, dba Nancy's Liquor, et al.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 The State of Texas filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Alps Realty of Texas, Inc , a Texas Corporation, dba Nancy's Liquor,. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court at Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********82-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The State of Texas

Defendants

Alps Realty of Texas, Inc.

2100 Estes Park Road

Southlake, TX 76092

b/s registered agent, Roger Pate

Fidelity Bank

1999 Bryan Street Suite 900

Dallas, TX 75201

a Georgia Financial Institution

b/s registered agent, CT Corporation System

Goodwill Industries of Fort Worth

4005 Campus Drive

Fort Worth, TX 76119

b/s registered agent, David G. Cox

National Retail Properties, LP

5444 Westheimer

Houston, TX 77056

b/s registered agent, Corporate Creations Net Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE LYNN LEVY

Defendant Attorneys

Charles B McFarland

DON C GRIFFIN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketPaper Returned Index # 22: Affidavit of Service - Fidelity Bank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketReturned Mail Index # 21: Award of Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-187475: The State of Texas: (22.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 22.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketCitation: eserved to Attorney; Goodwill Industries of Fort Worth: Unserved ; Fidelity Bank: Served: 11/18/2022; Returned: 11/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketRequest: Re: Citation with copies of Defendants Objecjections and Exceptions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketWaiver of Citation Index # 20: and Acceptance of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNotice of Deposit Index # 19

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-186821: Alps Realty of Texas, Inc.: (5.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant Alps Realty of Texas, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 5.00; Total Payments and Credits: 5.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketOath of Special Commissioners Index # 7: Oath Of Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Index # 6: for National Retail Properties, LP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketOrder Appointing Special Commissioners Index # 5: Electronically Served to Party's Attorney and/or Mailed to all Pro-Se Parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance of Counsel Index # 4: for Defendant Alps Realty of Texas Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 3: RE: Proposed Order Appointing Special Commissioners

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (137.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-182403: The State of Texas: (213.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff The State of Texas; Total Financial Assessment: 438.00; Total Payments and Credits: 372.00; Balance Due: 66.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Condemnation Index # 2: Petition for Condemnation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition - Condemnation Index # 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goodwill Industries of Fort Worth is a litigant

Latest cases where National Retail Properties, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEVY, KATHERINE LYNN