Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 08/05/2017 at 10:31:16 (UTC).

THE MANDOLIN/WHITE OAK PROPERTIES vs. DEL MCDONALD AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 THE MANDOLIN/WHITE OAK PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DEL MCDONALD AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Casey, Russell B. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8125

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 3

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Casey, Russell B

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE MANDOLIN/WHITE OAK PROPERTIES

2525 Highway 360

Euless, TX 76039

Defendant

MCDONALD, DEL

Euless, TX 76039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Rodriguez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2017
  • Dispositions: Dismissed by Plaintiff or Nonsuited; (Judicial Officer: Casey, Russell B.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Order of Non-Suit Without Prejudice Entered: JUDGE APPROVED AND SIGNED. COPY MAILED TO PLTF'S ATTY AND DEFN. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Motion for Non-Suit Filed: VIA FAX. FROM PLTF'S ATTY. W/O PREJUDICE. RCV'D W/CERT OF SERVICE AND ORDER. PRESENTED TO JUDGE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • CANCELED: Non-Jury Trial; (9:30 AM) (Judicial OfficerCasey, Russell B.) ; Non-Suit/Dismissed; SOUTHLAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Notice: Notice Of Non-Suit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Defendant Contacted Court: VIA PHONE. CHECKING IF THE CASE HAS BEEN DISMISSED. ADVISED THAT IT HAS NOT. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • Defendant Contacted Court: VIA PHONE. STATING THAT SHE WANTED TO COURT TO KNOW THAT SHE HAS MOVED OUT. ADVISED THAT THE CASE HAS NOT BEEN DISMISSED AND IS STILL SCHEDULED FOR 7/27/17 @ 9:30AM IN SOUTHLAKE. ADVISED THAT IT IS IN HER BEST INTEREST TO APPEAR TO THE TRIAL AS THE PLTF CAN GET A DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST HER IF SHE FAILS TO APPEAR. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Notice of Appearance Filed: VIA EFILE. FROM ATTY RODRIGUEZ. ON BEHALF OF THE PLTF. RCV'D W/CERT OF SERVICE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Citation Returned: EXECUTED IN PERSON ON 7/19/17 @ 7:25AM AT RESIDENCE. KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • EVICTION: MCDONALD, DEL: Served: 07/19/2017; Returned: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Citation Issued and Sent to C03 for Service: KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Military Affidavit Filed: KNS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Original Petition Filed (OCA Opening): SOUTHLAKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Counter Payment: Receipt # JP3-2017-02967: MARC DIKES/MANDOLIN: (116.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff THE MANDOLIN/WHITE OAK PROPERTIES; Total Financial Assessment: 116.00; Total Payments and Credits: 116.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Rodriguez