This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 03/07/2017 at 06:27:30 (UTC).

THE HILLS APARTMENTS vs. SHARON DILLOW AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 10/14/2014 THE HILLS APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against SHARON DILLOW AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Wright, Jacquelyn. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3438

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Wright, Jacquelyn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HILLS APARTMENTS

Defendant

DILLOW, SHARON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Wright, Jacquelyn) ; Judgment of $537.32; Awarded To: THE HILLS APARTMENTS; Awarded Against: SHARON DILLOW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: DILLOW, SHARON: Returned Unserved 11/20/2014; Returned: 11/20/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Constable

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2014
  • DocketLetter/Notice Returned Undelivered: Defn's copy of Judg/Dism. kn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • DocketHearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wright, Jacquelyn)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2014
  • DocketCITATION: DILLOW, SHARON: Served: 10/20/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • DocketGenerate Label

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2014-5700: THE HILLS APARTMENTS: (155.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2014-5619: BOB LEONARD LAW GROUP: (2.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2014
  • DocketTransaction Assessment: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • DocketCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2014-5191: THE HILLS APARTMENTS: (116.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • DocketFinancial Information: Plaintiff THE HILLS APARTMENTS; Total Financial Assessment: 273.00; Total Payments and Credits: 273.00; Balance Due as of 03/07/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 116.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hills Apartments is a litigant