This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 06/10/2022 at 08:03:43 (UTC).

THE HAVEN AT CHISHOLM TRAIL vs TERRICK LOCKRIDGE ETAL

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 THE HAVEN AT CHISHOLM TRAIL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against TERRICK LOCKRIDGE ETAL. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Pierson, Don. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********27-1

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Pierson, Don

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE HAVEN AT CHISHOLM TRAIL

5700 S Hulen St

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Defendants

LOCKRIDGE, TERRICK

Fort Worth, TX 76132

Etal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Israel L. Suster

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 21: Letter to Defendant about signed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketRule 306a Notice of Final DJ or Appealable Order Index # 19: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketJudgment - Agreed Index # 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketLetter Index # 18: RE: Filing - Proposed Agreed Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Judgment or Order Signed Index # 16: Electronically served to Party's attorney and/or mailed to all pro-se parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Withdraw Funds Index # 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketJudge Docket Entry: NJ trial. Mr Smith for Plaintiff. Defendant appeared. Agreement on record. sign paper order distribute $$

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial: (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Pierson, Don)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Hearing / Trial Index # 15

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialInability to Pay Court Cost: 350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Defendant LOCKRIDGE, TERRICK; Total Financial Assessment: 0.00; Total Payments and Credits: 0.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 350.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketLetter to Pauper Pro Bono Option Index # 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketLetter Notifying Parties of Case Filing Index # 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketJP Transcript of Judgment Index # 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Inability to Pay Index # 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketJP Judgment Index # 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Status Index # 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketJP Sworn Complaint for Eviction Index # 2:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketOCA Appeal Index # 1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPCP HAVEN CT OWNER LLC dba THE HAVEN AT CHISHOLM TRAIL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Israel L. Suster