Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 06/17/2021 at 13:42:44 (UTC).

The Crossings Apartments vs. Nancy A. Hale AND ALL OCCUPANTS

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 The Crossings Apartments filed an Other lawsuit against Nancy A Hale AND ALL OCCUPANTS. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judges overseeing this case are sGregory, Christopher,Gregory, Christopher, s Gregory, Christopher, Gregory, Christopher and Gregory, Christopher. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0490

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Justice Of The Peace Precinct 4

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judges

sGregory, Christopher,Gregory, Christopher

s Gregory, Christopher, Gregory, Christopher

Gregory, Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Crossings Apartments

2711 N. Haskell Ave. Suite 2400

Dallas, TX 75204

Defendant

Hale, Nancy A.

Saginaw, TX 76179

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Rodriguez

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketLetter/Notice Returned Undelivered: CONSTABLES MAILED CITATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialCounter Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-2474: The Crossings Apartments: (155.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • FinancialTransaction Assessment: 155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION: Hale, Nancy A.: Served: 05/13/2021; Returned: 05/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Issued to Constable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketWrit of Possession Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDispositions: Default Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Gregory, Christopher) ; Judgment; Awarded To: The Crossings Apartments; Awarded Against: Nancy Hale

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketHearing: (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gregory, Christopher) : Result: Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCitation Returned:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP4-2021-2121: The Crossings Apartments: (121.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff The Crossings Apartments; Total Financial Assessment: 276.00; Total Payments and Credits: 276.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 121.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCITATION: Hale, Nancy A.: Served: 04/20/2021; Returned: 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCitation Issued:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: Plaintiff's Sworn Complaint for Forcbile Detainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCP CROSSING LLC DBA THE CROSSINGS APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Rodriguez