Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 04/09/2021 at 08:12:30 (UTC).

The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc. vs Toula JNY Investments, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Toula JNY Investments, LLC. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********90-1

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    County Court At Law #1 - Tarrant County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.

Defendants

b/s its Registered Agent, Tzuchung Steven Wang

Grapevine, TX 76051

Toula JNY Investments, LLC

2551 Sw Grapevine Pkwy

Grapevine, TX 76051

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Javier Anziani

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPaper Returned Index #4: (Toula JNY Investments LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # CCLTF-170087: The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.: (258.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff The CIT Group/Commercial Services, Inc.; Total Financial Assessment: 258.00; Total Payments and Credits: 258.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCitation: mailed to atty 02/26; Toula JNY Investments, LLC: Served: 03/08/2021; Returned: 03/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketLetter Index #3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketOriginal Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIT GROUP COMMERCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANZIANI, JOSE JAVIER