Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Tarrant County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 02:42:50 (UTC).

The Blum Firm, P.C. and Griffith, Jay & Michel, LLP Plainfiffs v. David Waldrep, as Trustee of the Gaven and Grayson Family Trust Defendant

Case Summary

On 05/29/2020 The Blum Firm, P C and Griffith, Jay Michel, LLP Plainfiffs filed a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit against David Waldrep, as Trustee of the Gaven and Grayson Family Trust Defendant. This case was filed in Tarrant County Courts, Probate Court #1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********81-1

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Tarrant County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Probate Court #1

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

The Blum Firm, P.C.

777 Main St Ste 700

Fort Worth, TX 76102

Griffith, Jay & Michel

2200 Forest Park Blvd

Fort Worth, TX 76110

Defendant

Waldrep, David

Mansfield, TX 76063

Not Classified By Court

Ramon, Grayson

Mansfield, TX 76063

Ramon, Gavin

Mansfield, TX 76063

Unknown, Missing, or Incapacitated Heir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David C. Bakutis

Thomas M. Michel

Not Classified By Court and Defendant Attorney

John A. Hixson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index #6: First Amended Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketExhibit Index #5: A through E-4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketMotion for Default Judgment Index #4: No Answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketAnswer/Response Index #3: Original - Gaven Ramon and Grayson Ramon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketAmended Petition/Motion/Application Index #2: Plaintiff's First Amended Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCitation - Personal: Gavin Ramon; Ramon, Gavin: Served: 06/06/2020; Returned: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCitation - Personal: Grayson Ramon; Ramon, Grayson: Served: 06/06/2020; Returned: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • DocketCitation - Personal: David Waldrep; Waldrep, David: Served: 06/08/2020; Returned: 06/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • FinancialeFiling Payments: Receipt # PRTF-103320: Bakutis, David: (244.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Applicant Bakutis, David; Total Financial Assessment: 244.00; Total Payments and Credits: 244.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 244.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Original Petition Index #1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas M. Michel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. Bakutis