This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 02/10/2017 at 09:50:15 (UTC).

TELEFLORA LLC vs. JAMES W NORWOOD AS GUARANTOR OF ROTHERMEL FLOWERS II

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 TELEFLORA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JAMES W NORWOOD AS GUARANTOR OF ROTHERMEL FLOWERS II. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Justice Of The Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************1934

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TELEFLORA LLC

Defendant

JAMES W NORWOOD AS GUARANTOR OF ROTHERMEL FLOWERS II

2302 River Road

Grandbury, TX 76048

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James B. Carroll, III

Defendant Attorney

ANDREW F STASIO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2017
  • Pre-Trial Mediation: (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Swearingin, Ralph, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Notice: MAILED TO BOTH ATTYS ON MARCH PTM SETTING // JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Mailed Letter to all Parties-Case Transferred to this Court: JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Plaintiff Paid Filing Fees on Transferred Case: MAILED RECEIPT TO PLTF ATTY // JA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Notice of Filing Fees to be Paid Mailed to Plaintiff: DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 11/18/2016 TRANCRIPT OF DOCKET FROM JP3 DALLAS COUNTY//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 11/18/2016 ORDER GRANTING DEFN MTN TO TRANS VENUE//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 11/18/2016 DEFN FIRST AMENDED MTN TO TRANS VENUE FILED WITH DALLAS COUNTY//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 11/4/2016 HEARING LTR MLD TO PLTF ON DEFN MTN TO TRANS VENUE BY DALLAS COUNTY//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 11/3/2016 MTN FILED BY DEFN TO TRANS VENUE//PER DALLAS COUNT//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 11/3/2016 CTN RETURNED TO DALLAS COUNTY SERVD ON 10/24/2016//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 10/13/2016 CTN ISSUED TO ATTY BY DALLAS COUNTY//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Comments: 10/12/2016 SC PETITION FILED ALONG WITH ORIGINAL PET AND MTN FROM DEFN TO TRANS CASE//DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Case Transferred from Another Court (OCA Opening): DE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Mail Payment: Receipt # JP1-2016-04812: Carroll, James B., III: (41.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2016
  • Financial Information: Plaintiff TELEFLORA LLC; Total Financial Assessment: 41.00; Total Payments and Credits: 41.00; Balance Due as of 02/10/2017: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 41.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teleflora LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew F Stasio, JR