This case was last updated from Tarrant County Justice Courts on 10/02/2022 at 17:09:24 (UTC).

TD Bank USA, N.A. vs. Megan Gackle

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 TD Bank USA, N A filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Megan Gackle. This case was filed in Tarrant County Justice Courts, Tarrant County Justice of the Peace Precinct 1 located in Tarrant, Texas. The Judge overseeing this case is Swearingin, Ralph, JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************2157

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Tarrant, Texas

Judge Details

Judge

Swearingin, Ralph, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TD Bank USA, N.A.

7000 Target Parkway N

Brooklyn Park, MN 55445

Defendant

Gackle, Megan

North Richland Hill, TX 76180-1625

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jessica Kim Olsen-Zhang

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDispositions: Agreed Judgment; (Judicial Officer: Swearingin, Ralph, JR) ; Judgment of $951.68; Awarded To: TD Bank USA, N.A.; Awarded Against: Megan Gackle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Entered: NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketAgreed Judgment Filed: EFILED// BY PLTF ATTY (SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES)// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer Due On: FV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketAffidavit/Proof of Service Filed: Return of Service// EFILED// SERVD VIA ALT SERV// TDH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketEmailed: SIGNED ORDER TO PPS// NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketOrder Approving Alternate Service Entered: ALT SRV ORDER/EFILED/ ON BOTH METHODS/ NO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketAffidavit for Alternate Service Filed: EFILED/ EMAIL TO: RSIEHcourts@abclegal.com//HG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEmailed: CTN AND PETN TO PPS//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDEBT CLAIM: EMAILED ABC LEGAL//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialState Credit: (21.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialInternet Payment: Receipt # JP1-2022-04149: TD Bank USA, N.A.: (33.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • FinancialFinancial Information: Plaintiff TD Bank USA, N.A.; Total Financial Assessment: 54.00; Total Payments and Credits: 54.00; Balance Due: 0.00. Transaction Assessment: 54.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketEFile Original Petition Document: EFILED/EMAILED TO: rsiehcourts@abclegal.com//ME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketOriginal Petition Filed (OCA Opening)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Olsen-Zhang